Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/29/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/2010