Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/03/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/03/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/03/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/10/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/10/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/22/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/14/2010