Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/12/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/23/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/23/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew