Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/09/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/09/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/12/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/04/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/06/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2010