Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/09/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/09/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/20/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/26/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/30/2010