Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/23/2010