Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/28/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/01/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/01/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/01/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/01/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/30/2010