Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/04/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/10/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/30/2010