Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/28/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/14/2010