Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/09/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/23/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/23/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/23/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/21/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/12/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/19/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/19/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/24/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/24/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/10/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/10/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/23/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/01/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/29/2010