There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare You Can Buy Into Act
Public Option Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for an option for any citizen or permanent resident of the United States to buy into Medicare.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/09/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/18/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/09/2010Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2010Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1213-1214)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/11/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/11/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/11/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/16/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/16/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/17/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/17/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/17/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/18/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/18/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/09/2010 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/18/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4789.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/2010)

Public Option Act or the Medicare You Can Buy Into Act - Amends part A of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to authorize an option for any citizen or permanent resident of the United States to buy into Medicare.