Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/11/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/11/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/11/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/11/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/16/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/16/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/17/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/17/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/17/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/18/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/18/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2010