Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/03/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/03/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/03/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/09/2009