Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/16/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/25/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/14/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/05/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/05/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/2010