Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/09/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/17/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/15/2010