Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/09/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/12/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/26/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/08/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/08/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2010