Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/18/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/09/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/14/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/14/2010