Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/12/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/20/2010