Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 08/10/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/14/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/16/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/16/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/22/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/22/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/22/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/23/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/23/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/21/2010