Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2009