Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/10/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/11/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/12/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/16/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/16/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/17/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/17/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/17/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/17/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/17/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/17/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/18/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/18/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/18/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/18/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/19/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/23/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/23/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/23/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/23/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/23/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/24/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/24/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/24/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/25/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/13/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/14/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/20/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/20/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/06/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/06/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/18/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/08/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/29/2010