Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/28/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/09/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/19/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/23/2010