Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/15/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/15/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/26/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2010