Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/18/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/09/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/03/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/11/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/28/2010