Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/27/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/03/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/03/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/17/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/21/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/27/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/16/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/22/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/23/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/28/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/14/2010