Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/18/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/24/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/24/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/24/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/14/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/14/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/15/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/21/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/26/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/28/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/11/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/18/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/01/2010