There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Forecast for the Future Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the President's budget and the congressional budget to disclose and display the net present value of future costs of entitlement programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/16/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/16/2010Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2010Referred to House Budget
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2010Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/18/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/22/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/22/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/27/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/27/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/29/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget03/16/2010 Referred to
House Rules03/16/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4856.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4856. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2010)

Forecast for the Future Act of 2010 - Requires the President's budget to Congress to include a detailed, separate analysis and display, by budget function, agency, and program, of the net present value of future costs of each entitlement program for the fiscal year for which the budget is submitted and each of the four ensuing fiscal years.

Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 (CBA) to require concurrent budget resolutions to include, for display purposes only and for each entitlement program, the net present value of the future costs of the program over a 75-year time frame.

Directs the congressional budget committees to hold hearings in each Congress with a goal of developing a plan to restore the government to a sustainable long-term fiscal path.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to submit to the President and Congress a report listing: (1) the fiscal exposures of the government; and (2) the net present value of the future costs of the program over a 75-year time frame.

Amends the CBA to require the Director of the Congressional Budget Office (CBO) to submit a similar report to Congress.