Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/16/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/18/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/22/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/22/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/27/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/27/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/29/2010