Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/18/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/14/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/04/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/22/2010