There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Healthy School Meals Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide plant-based commodities under the school lunch program under the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act and the school breakfast program under the Child Nutrition Act of 1966, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/17/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/30/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
03/17/2010Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/17/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/24/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/28/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/17/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities04/30/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4870.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4870. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/17/2010)

Healthy School Meals Act of 2010 - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to select school food authorities to participate in a pilot program evaluating the use of plant-based alternate protein products and fluid milk substitutes under the school lunch and breakfast programs.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) deliver plant-based alternate protein products and fluid milk substitutes to such food authorities at no cost for the preparation of meals under the school lunch and breakfast programs; and (2) assess which of such foods would be best for more general use in the school lunch and breakfast programs, and deliver them for general use under such programs, within two years of this Acts' enactment.

Requires the Secretary, within two years of this Act's enactment, to promulgate regulations that: (1) reflect specific recommendations for increased consumption of plant-based foods; and (2) provide for the distribution of supplemental commodity assistance or cash in lieu thereof to states and certain school food authorities that offer a plant-based entree on their daily lunch menus, for the purchase of entirely plant-based commodity food products or fluid milk substitutes.

Requires schools participating in the school lunch program to serve a nondairy beverage that is nutritionally equivalent to fluid milk and meets certain nutritional standards to students who cannot consume fluid milk because of a disability or medical or other special dietary need. (Eliminates the requirement that students who cannot consume fluid milk due to a disability provide schools with a statement from a physician that identifies such disability and specifies the fluid milk substitute.)