Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/24/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/28/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2010