Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/18/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/18/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/18/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/23/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/23/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/06/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/13/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/13/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/27/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/10/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/24/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/01/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2010