Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/18/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/24/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/26/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/28/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/09/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/14/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/13/2010