Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2010