Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/23/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/24/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/24/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/24/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/24/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/24/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/24/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/24/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/24/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/26/2010