There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Redistricting Transparency Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require States to carry out Congressional redistricting in accordance with a process under which members of the public are informed of redistricting proposals and have the opportunity to participate in the development of such proposals prior to their adoption, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/23/2010 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/15/2010 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/23/2010 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2010 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/21/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/21/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/22/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/19/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/23/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties06/15/2010 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.4918.

Subjects (6)

  • Congressional elections
  • Congressional operations and organization
  • Internet and video services
  • Public participation and lobbying
  • State and local government operations

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/2010)

Redistricting Transparency Act of 2010 - Requires states to carry out congressional redistricting in accordance with a process under which members of the public are informed of redistricting proposals via the Internet and have the opportunity to participate in the development of such proposals prior to their adoption.

Requires each state redistricting entity to establish and maintain a public Internet site meeting specified requirements.

Requires the state redistricting entity to: (1) solicit the input of members of the public in its work to develop initial congressional redistricting plans for the state; and (2) post the proposed final plan on the Internet site 10 days before its adoption, as well as 7 days after its adoption, together with a map, the reasons for adoption, dissenting opinions, and certain other information.