Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/21/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/21/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/21/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/22/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/19/2010