There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Employing Youth for the American Dream Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To create and encourage the creation of jobs for youth, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/30/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
03/26/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/24/2010Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2010Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2010Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2010Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2010Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/26/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/06/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2010

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/24/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness04/30/2010 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/24/2010 Referred to
House Natural Resources03/24/2010 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands03/26/2010 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform03/24/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4920.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4920. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/2010)

Employing Youth for the American Dream Act of 2010 - Amends the Workforce Investment Act of 1998 to expand to age 24 the age eligibility requirements under the youth opportunity grants program for youth activities.

Directs the Secretary of Labor (Secretary) to make certain allotments to states for summer jobs programs for disconnected youth (youth age 16 to 24 who are not regularly employed or attending school).

Requires the Secretary to award grants to states to carry out employment programs for the partial reimbursement of wages paid by employers of small or medium-sized business concerns for new hires or rehires of former employees. Requires states to give priority for payments to eligible employers who hire or rehire a disconnected youth.

Requires the Secretary to make allotments and grants to states to carry out eligible on-the-job training programs for disconnected youth.

Directs the President to establish a public service employment program to employ individuals to carry out works of a public nature in connection with parks, roads, schools, and after-school programs. Requires priority for such jobs to be given to individuals who are long-term unemployed, low-income, and disconnected youth.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend the work opportunity tax credit through calendar 2015; (2) include as a member of a targeted group for purposes of such credit a qualified Title 1-B youth services recipient and rename a "qualified ex-felon" as a "qualified ex-offender" for purposes of the credit; (3) double the amount of allowable wages that may be considered in calculating such credit; (4) revive and extend the designation period for tax-preferred empowerment zones and revive certain zone designations that terminated on December 31, 2009; and (5) allow an employer tax credit through 2012 for the employment of disconnected youth.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to give preference to the hiring of individuals age 16 to 24 for federal park and forestry jobs.

Authorizes contracting officers of executive agencies to give preference in the award of federal contracts for the procurement of goods and services to employers: (1) that employ, in a youth apprenticeship and in the performance of the contract, disconnected youth who reside in high unemployment areas; and (2) whose contracts are funded for FY2011 under a law enacted to create infrastructure, transportation, or green energy jobs.