Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/24/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/21/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/15/2010