Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/24/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/08/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/14/2010