Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/14/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/14/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/27/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/10/2010