Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/26/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/26/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/26/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/20/2010