Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/13/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2010