Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/29/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/23/2010