There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Conservation Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strengthen the capacity of the United States to lead the international community in reversing renewable natural resource degradation trends around the world that threaten to undermine global prosperity and security and eliminate the diversity of life on Earth.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/25/2010Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/25/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/29/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/30/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/15/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/25/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4959. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/25/2010)

Global Conservation Act of 2010 - Directs the President, through the Coordinator for Global Conservation, to establish the International Conservation Strategy to help combat global natural resource and biodiversity degradation in developing countries.

Directs the Coordinator to establish the Interagency Working Group on Global Conservation.

Directs the President to establish the President's Advisory Committee for Global Conservation.

Urges the President to work with the world's major foreign assistance donor countries to: (1) develop an international conservation assistance strategy; (2) identify multilateral coordinating mechanisms; and (3) promote existing multilateral initiatives designed to identify meaningful levels of interim funding for forest conservation in developing countries.