Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/29/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/30/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/15/2010