Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/25/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/25/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/27/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/01/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/01/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/30/2010