Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/09/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/16/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/16/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/16/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/16/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/16/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2010