Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/14/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/21/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/21/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/21/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/27/2010