Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/28/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/14/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/22/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/17/2010